+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB34ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 984921726-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 984921726
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor