+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB339E
- Printed as engrossed 18100744D-E
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100744D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor