+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
On April 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB337ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 960846760-S1
- Substitute by Mr. Goode agreed to 960846760-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 960846760-S1 (Goode)
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp.(38-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960784815
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
February 6, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor