+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106153D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB335S1
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20106153D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100145D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard H. Stuart
Type:
Primary Sponsor