+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Appropriations by voice vote
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 18106894D-S1
- Floor substitute printed 18107010D-S2 (Peake)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 18107010D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB334S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106894D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100471D
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor