+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Mims agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981506743-E
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 981506743
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amd. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor