+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB330ER)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 000298216-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 000298216
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor