+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB0104)
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 964831757-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 964831757
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor