+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 187 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB329ER)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105836D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB329S1
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105836D-S1
- Incorporates SB455 (McClellan)
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102967D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health