+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 4/8/16)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB329ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 16106297D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates: Pillion, Kilgore, Mason
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Carrico, Stanley, Favola
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB329H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105833D-H1
- Read third time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105833D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Senator Carrico agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105032D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB329ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Printed as engrossed 16105032D-ES1
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 16105032D-S1
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 16103334D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (15)
March 11, 2016: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 11, 2016: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2016: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
March 2, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 12, 2016: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor