+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB327ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 2
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 003837516