+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB326ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD2227352 (SB326H1)
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD2198661 (SB326S1)
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor