+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB325ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of House sub. agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 4-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7963124 (SB325H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from R. & I. N. (19-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 8-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD0602661 (SB325E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (12-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 4-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. (19-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 8-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor