+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB325ER)
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 040225820-H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB325H1
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 040225820-H1
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from H. W. I. (20-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 041380820-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB325E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 041380820
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. (20-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor