+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/00)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB322ER)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 005044540-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 005044540
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2000: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor