+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB321ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB321H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 041027820-H1
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 041027820-H1
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 040961820-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. w/amds. SB321ES1
- Printed as engrossed 040961820-ES1
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 040961820-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 040191104