+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080093340
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor