+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
On April 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 653 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB318ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 006177524-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006177524-H1
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 006177524-H1
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee:1
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 004433524-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 004433524