+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 4/5/06)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB318ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB318H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064010556-H1
- Read third time
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 064010556-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/06 061184134
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor