+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending question, not ordered (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes No
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (7-Y 5-N 2-A)
On January 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103674D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
January 22, 2020: Pending question, not ordered (20-Y 20-N)
January 22, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
January 16, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer A. Kiggans
Type:
Primary Sponsor