+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/00)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB317ER)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (94-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (20-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 004725524
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
February 16, 2000: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (20-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor