+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective - see bill)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB315ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 082415228-S3 (Edwards)
- Floor substitute printed 082416228-S4 (Edwards)
- Substitute by Senator Edwards withdrawn 082415228-S2
- Substitute by Senator Edwards withdrawn 082415228-S3
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Edwards rejected 082416228-S4
- Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 082399228-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB315ES1
- Printed as engrossed 082399228-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 082399228-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Floor substitute printed 082415228-S2 (Edwards)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 7-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 082399228-S1
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088531874