+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB314ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 872 (effective 7/1/08)
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB314ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 081878744-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB314H1
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 081878744-H1
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082360228
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 23, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
April 23, 2008: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2008: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor