+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 985374805-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 985374805