+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2000 in the House:
- Continued to 2001 in Courts of Justice (15-Y 8-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Militia and Police (21-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 1
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 005176524-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 005176524