+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB311ER)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 10
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 042956736