+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 4/16/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB31ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989766809-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989766809-H1
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 2-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989766809-H1
- Read second time
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985333809-E
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.12/19/97 985333809
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 2-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor