+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB308ER)
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB308ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 16103711D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB308E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103711D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor