+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB306ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088648316
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor