+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
On March 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB305ER)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 068033124
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor