+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB0044)
- Stricken from docket by C. J. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 960139817-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 960139817-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 960139817-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Juvenile Justice
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 963333817