+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB302ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amd.
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected
- Substitute by Del. Cranwell agreed to
- Amendment by Del. McDonnell agreed to
- Floor substitute printed LD3794176 (SB302H2)
- Passed House with sub. with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendment waived
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD1321728 (SB302H1)
- Read second time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD9108728 (SB302S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor