+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB301ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22106466D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB301H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106466D-H1
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106466D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB301S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105383D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105383D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 22104152D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2022: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor