+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
On October 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 1/1/95)
On October 6, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On October 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On September 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB3004ER)
On September 29, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On September 28, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On September 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On September 27, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On September 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On September 27, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On September 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
On September 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (6)
September 29, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
September 28, 1994: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
September 27, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
September 27, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
September 27, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
September 20, 1994: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Hunter B. Andrews
Type:
Primary Sponsor