+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB300E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 20100392D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100392D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
William M. Stanley, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor