+ − Summary
+ − Actions (28)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Quayle rejected
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Uncontested committee amendments agreed to
- Contested committee amendment (Item 21) agreed to
- Contested comm. amdt. (second Item 211) agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Contested comm. amd. (second Item 605) agreed to
- Contested committee amendment (Item 643) agreed to
- Contested committee amendment (Item C-22) agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Special and Continuing Order-12:30 p.m. 2/24/94
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/93
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1994: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor