+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Uncontested committee amendments agreed to
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.5 Item 1 #10s)
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.30 Item 73 #2s)
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.226 Item 433 #39s)
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.243 Item 459 #2s)
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.262 Item 499 #2s)
- Cont. com. amdt. agd. to (P.266 Item 523 #10s) (32-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO V (32-Y 7-N)
- Contested com. amdt. agreed to (P.309 Item C-11.01 #1s)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Marye agreed to (P.309 Item C-11.01 #1s)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Woods withdrawn
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 4-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Motion for Special and Continuing Order (40-Y 0-N)
- Special and Continuing Order - 2/26/98 at 12:30 p.m.
- Budget amendments available
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/97 989803753
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 4-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO V (32-Y 7-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (34-Y 4-N)
February 23, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor