+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB3ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Claims
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Fin. sub-committee: Trans/Special Grants
On January 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/15/93
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Claims (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor