+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB3ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 986561728-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/21/97 986561728
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor