+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB299ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendment waived
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (32-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (32-Y 6-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 45-N)
- Passed House with sub. with amendment (52-Y 45-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute with amd.
- VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 33-N)
- Amendment by Del. Hamilton agreed to (59-Y 33-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD5575728 (SB299H1)
- Read second time
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD3942728 (SB299E)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (32-Y 6-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 33-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 45-N)
March 8, 1994: Reported from C. J. with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor