+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (23-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988368728-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (10-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988368728
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (23-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (35-Y 5-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor