+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate
- Amendment #2 by Senator Watkins withdrawn
- Amendments by Senator Watkins rejected
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101912D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 1, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
February 1, 2010: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
January 27, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor