+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB295ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101671D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor