+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106251D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB293S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 18106251D-S1
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103370D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2018: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor