+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB291ER)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101543D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor