+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N)
- Failed to refer to Committee on Appropriations
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB290S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106369D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106369D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103777D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2022: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N)
February 14, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor