+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- No action taken by General Laws by voice vote
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 964156757-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964156757-S1
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964156757-S1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 960767801
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1996: Reported from General Laws with sub. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor