+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Budget amendments available
- Special & Continuing Order for Thursday 2/24/00 12:30 p.m.
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Motion for Special & Continuing Order agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/17/99 009803408
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2000: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor