+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Motion for Special and Continuing Order (40-Y 0-N)
- Special and Continuing Order - 2/26/98 at 12:30 p.m.
- Budget amendments available
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/97 989801753
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor