+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 86 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB289ER)
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
- Passed House (88-Y 10-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. (19-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (23-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (34-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (7-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed